Maths Tricks

Short Maths Tricks

short-maths-tricks-in-hindi

 Learn Maths Tricks In Hindi

15 se Multiply  karne ki Short tricks


Q.   245 X 15

Step 1 :- Put zero (0)
2450

Step 2 :- And divide by 2
     (1)  ------- 2450 /   2
     (2) -------  1225  

Step 3 :- add (1) and (2)
                 2450
               +1225
   Ans =    3675

Example :

Q.1  943 X 15

Step 1 :- Put zero (0)
9430
Step 2 :- And divide by 2
     (1)  ------- 9430 /   2
     (2) -------  4715 
Step 3 :- add (1) and (2)
                 9430
               +4715
   Ans =    14145

Q.   5124 X 15

Step 1 :- Put zero (0)
51240
Step 2 :- And divide by 2
     (1)  ------- 51240 /   2
     (2) -------  25620 
Step 3 :- add (1) and (2)
                 51240
               +25640
   Ans =    76860

Q.   45209 X 15

Step 1 :- Put zero (0)
452090
Step 2 :- And divide by 2
     (1)  ------- 452090 /   2
     (2) -------  226045 
Step 3 :- add (1) and (2)
                 452090
               +226045
   Ans =    678135


Click Here to Learn :- 11 se Multiply karne ki Simple Trick

Click Here to Learn :- GK Simple Trick in Hindi

 Click Here to Learn :- टैक्स को याद रखने के लिए Simple Trick


Maths Tricks In Hindi

Simple Maths Tricks In Hindi

simple-maths-tricks

Learn Maths Trick in Hindi

9 se Multiply karne ki short trick

Q.      5129 X 9

Step 1 :- put zero (0)
Sabse pahle zero ko digit k last  me rakhna hai. 
51290

 Step 2 :- minus (-) same number
            51290
             -5129
Ans =       46161


Example :-

Q.1   68 X 9

Put zero
680
Minus(-) same number
              680
              -68
Ans =     612

Q.2   598X9

Put zero
5980
Minus same number
               5980
               -598
Ans =      5382

Q.3    4873 X 9

Put zero
48730
Minus same number
             48730
              -4873
Ans =   43857

Q.4  98205 X 9

Put zero
982050
Minus same number
                982050
                -98205
Ans =      883845

Click Here To Learn :- Maths Short Tricks


Simple Maths Tricks

Maths Short Tricks in Hindi

Learn Maths Tricks in Hindi

mats-tricks-in-hindi

Esay Maths Simple Trick

5 se Multiply karne ki Short Trick 

 

 Q. 5142 X 5

Put zero on last digit number
51420

and divide by 2
51420 / 2

Ans = 25710

Example :  

Q.1  520 X 5

put zero on last digit number
5200
and divide by 2
520 / 2
Ans = 2600

Q.2  9825 X 5

Put zero on last digit number
98250
and divide by 2
9825 / 2
Ans =  49125

Q.3  72862 X 5

Put zero on last digit number
728620
and divide by 2 
728620 / 2
Ans = 364310

Q.4  162895 X 5

Put zero on last digit number
1628950
and divide by 2
1628950 / 2
Ans = 814475

Click Here to Learn :- 11 se Multiply karne ki Simple Trick

Click Here to Learn :- GK Simple Trick in Hindi

 Click Here to Learn :- टैक्स को याद रखने के लिए Simple Trick

 
maths-tricks-in-hindi

 

Maths Short Tricks

Maths Short Tricks

Learn Maths Short Tricks in Hindi

mats-tricks-in-hindi


Easy Maths Simple Tricks

11 se multiply karne ki Simple Trick

For 3 or more Digit Number


Q.1  243 X 11

1 Step : Put 0 (zero) on both sides

zero (0) ko multiply karne wali Digit k aage or piche wali digit par likhna hai.

0 2 4 3 0

2 Step : In sabke do pair bana kar Add(+) karna hai.

02430

0+2, 2+4, 4+3, 3+0

3 Step : Last wale pair se Adding karenge

0+2  2+4  4+3  3+0
  2      6       7      3

Ans = 2673


Example :

Q.1   9725 X 11

Put 0 on both sides

097250

0+9,9+7,7+2,2+5,5+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 106975

Q.2   80459 X 11

Put 0 on both sides

0804590

0+8,8+0,0+4,4+5,5+9,9+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 885049

Q.3   259673 X 11

Put 0 on both sides

02596730

0+2, 2+5, 5+9, 9+6, 6+7, 7+3, 3+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 2856403

Q.4   695 X 11

Put  0 on both sides

06950

0+6, 6+9, 9+5, 5+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 7645


11 se multiply karne ki Simple Trick

For 3 or more Digit Number

mats-tricks-in-hindi

Click Here to :-  Learn Simple GK Tricks In Hindi