Maths Short Tricks

Maths Short Tricks

Learn Maths Short Tricks in Hindi

mats-tricks-in-hindi


Easy Maths Simple Tricks

11 se multiply karne ki Simple Trick

For 3 or more Digit Number


Q.1  243 X 11

1 Step : Put 0 (zero) on both sides

zero (0) ko multiply karne wali Digit k aage or piche wali digit par likhna hai.

0 2 4 3 0

2 Step : In sabke do pair bana kar Add(+) karna hai.

02430

0+2, 2+4, 4+3, 3+0

3 Step : Last wale pair se Adding karenge

0+2  2+4  4+3  3+0
  2      6       7      3

Ans = 2673


Example :

Q.1   9725 X 11

Put 0 on both sides

097250

0+9,9+7,7+2,2+5,5+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 106975

Q.2   80459 X 11

Put 0 on both sides

0804590

0+8,8+0,0+4,4+5,5+9,9+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 885049

Q.3   259673 X 11

Put 0 on both sides

02596730

0+2, 2+5, 5+9, 9+6, 6+7, 7+3, 3+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 2856403

Q.4   695 X 11

Put  0 on both sides

06950

0+6, 6+9, 9+5, 5+0

Adding from last side

Ans = 7645


11 se multiply karne ki Simple Trick

For 3 or more Digit Number

mats-tricks-in-hindi

Click Here to :-  Learn Simple GK Tricks In Hindi


Share this

Related Posts

Previous
Next Post »